PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK UK

Charity number: 327215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £559.49k £468.71k £553.18k £730.01k £1.06m
Total expenditure £545.27k £459.38k £475.84k £733.64k £804.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £88.81k £21.90k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.22k N/A £24.67k £27.19k £221.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £592 £587 £471
Income - Charitable activities £539.88k N/A £527.92k £701.08k £837.87k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £3 £1.16k £129
Income - Other £388 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £200.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £539.83k N/A £475.35k £733.63k £803.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £481 £9 £580
Expenditure - Governance £4.00k N/A £0 £0 £4.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £255.74k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0