Financial history XSPAND - ST PIUS AID FOR THE NEEDY AND DESTITUTE

Charity number: 327344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £19.65k £5.72k £7.21k £4.30k £3.46k
Total expenditure £7.41k £23.04k £5.13k £5.21k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A