Financial history FAITH WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 327557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £33.03k £77.37k £71.52k £55.63k £49.44k
Total expenditure £45.73k £56.26k £90.65k £60.38k £53.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A