TOFS

Charity number: 327735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £76.73k £118.39k £129.03k £156.95k £120.04k
Total expenditure £66.31k £71.29k £101.02k £97.24k £92.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A