Accounts and annual returns THE ARAB CULTURAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 327877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 March 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required