THE IRELAND FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 327889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £841.71k £832.62k £1.17m £784.40k £599.48k
Total expenditure £809.09k £857.93k £1.37m £720.49k £654.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.32k
Income - Donations and legacies £528.53k £630.61k £905.42k £519.35k £560.89k
Income - Other trading activities £313.02k £201.86k £262.46k £264.81k £38.57k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £166 £150 £561 £235 £17
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £543.64k £660.12k £1.10m £472.59k £528.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £265.46k £197.81k £270.91k £247.90k £125.94k
Expenditure - Governance £5.08k £3.29k £7.31k £16.28k £5.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £538.56k £656.83k £1.09m £456.31k £523.25k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0