Trustees THE IRELAND FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 327889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RORY GODSON Chair 23 October 2013
None on record
Susan Anne O'Brien Trustee 10 September 2021
None on record
Susan Whelan Trustee 15 June 2021
VICHAI SRIVADDHANAPRABHA FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
LEICESTER CITY FOOTBALL CLUB TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Bridget Walsh Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Emer Finnan Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Evelyn Bourke Trustee 09 February 2021
None on record
Brian Dickie Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Declan Tiernan Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
John Feeney Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Conor Hillery Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Rachel Naughton Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Emily Patricia Bohill Trustee 14 May 2018
THE STORY OF CHRISTMAS
Received: On time
Eoin Bastible Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
GARRETT HAYES Trustee 06 November 2013
None on record
RUAIRI CONNEELY Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
ZACH WEBB Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
SEAMUS MCGARRY Trustee
IRISH CULTURAL CENTRE HAMMERSMITH LTD
Received: 92 days late