THE AMMCO TRUST

Charity number: 327962
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £57.55k £59.66k £59.88k £58.21k £60.85k
Total expenditure £69.26k £70.73k £50.30k £74.10k £54.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A