Accounts and annual returns THE CARA TRUST

Charity number: 328124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 06 October 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 07 June 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 07 June 2019 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window