THE CARA TRUST

Charity number: 328124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £204.43k £231.02k £250.17k £0 £0
Total expenditure £235.23k £257.32k £269.41k £59.89k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.86k £300 N/A N/A N/A