Accounts and annual returns MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 328541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 20 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window