Trustees MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 328541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN DAVID THOMPSON Chair 22 October 2006
MARCHING AND PERFORMING ARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
SOUTHERN KNIGHTS PERFORMING ARTS
Received: On time
LEE ANTONY JEX Trustee 24 November 2021
THE EAST COAST ELITE BRASS AND PERCUSSION CORPS
Received: On time
BARRY DAVIS Trustee 09 June 2019
MAYFLOWER PERFORMING ARTS GROUP
Received: On time
John James Fitzpatrick Trustee 14 January 2018
MARCHING AND PERFORMING ARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
LEE RICHARD COURT Trustee 27 June 2012
None on record
MARK ANTHONY GUTTERIDGE Trustee
MARCHING AND PERFORMING ARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
AVENGER PERFORMING ARTS
Received: On time
MARK PETER NICHOLSON Trustee
SING FROM THE HEART
Received: On time
NORTHERN ACADEMY OF PERFORMING ARTS
Overdue by 1787 days
COMMUNITY ACTION BRADFORD & DISTRICT LTD.
Received: On time
THE COMPANY PERFORMANCE ENSEMBLE
Received: On time