TRUST FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION ON THE ARMS TRADE (TREAT)

Charity number: 328694
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 May 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 May 2021 7 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 08 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download