Accounts and annual returns THE NUTMEG CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328712
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 May 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required