THE NUTMEG CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £382 £283 £325 £1.64k £278
Total expenditure £3.10k £3.06k £3.02k £2.33k £3.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A