ADAR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328731
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download