ADAR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328731
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £78.46k £20.61k £23.12k £18.85k £120.57k
Total expenditure £80.59k £33.02k £15.70k £22.83k £28.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A