Financial history THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1062674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £702.58k £741.26k £965.62k £988.47k £1.02m
Total expenditure £780.83k £762.48k £917.59k £860.49k £1.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £223.95k £222.73k £196.55k £186.57k £215.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £697.67k £734.29k £948.75k £974.47k £1.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £300 £295 £7.39k £5.95k £6.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.61k £6.68k £9.48k £8.06k £5.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.66k
Income - Legacies £26.43k £2.00k £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £722.72k £662.09k £790.97k £747.57k £991.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £58.12k £100.39k £126.62k £112.92k £146.84k
Expenditure - Governance £1.08k £0 £0 £0 £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £157.46k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0