Financial history AREOPAGUS ROMANIA TRUST

Charity number: 1064613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.63k £1.24k £604 £556 £661
Total expenditure £1.63k £1.38k £780 £60 £780
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A