Financial history HAWLEY PAVILION TRUST

Charity number: 1061769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £13.97k £12.05k £11.72k £29.52k £9.74k
Total expenditure £7.12k £5.37k £4.94k £60.58k £9.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A