THE ROWLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1062148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time Download