Trustees HARMSTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 1062434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Wright Chair 14 January 2021
None on record
Gillian Dowse Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
David Julien Otho Bridges Trustee 07 October 2023
None on record
Helen Stephanie Robertson Trustee 07 October 2023
None on record
Teresa Jane Bridges Trustee 29 November 2019
None on record
KEREN LOUISE SHEPHERD Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record
BRIAN HAMILTON Trustee 24 November 2016
None on record
KATE STOCKBRIDGE-SIME Trustee 07 December 2011
None on record