Governing document PRIMARY SCIENCE TEACHING TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2012 as amended on 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO HELP IMPROVE IN BRITAIN THE EDUCATION AND / OR TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND / OR THE EDUCATION AND / OR TRAINING OF THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR TEACHING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SCIENCE AND RELATED SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO PRIMARY SCHOOL TEACHING.
Area of benefit
BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.