Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE OUTREACH TRUST

Charity number: 1062318
Charity reporting is overdue by 1584 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 853 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 853 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1219 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1219 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1584 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1584 days