Financial history INTERNATIONAL RESCUE COMMITTEE, U.K

Charity number: 1065972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £142.62m £143.67m £133.43m £113.91m £115.72m
Total expenditure £142.52m £143.49m £133.45m £113.55m £113.77m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £2.58m N/A
Income from government grants £59.73m £137.85m £52.61m £56.67m £57.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.03m £5.76m £1.57m £2.63m £3.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £138.55m £137.85m £131.80m £111.27m £111.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33.00k £63.00k £52.00k £19.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £927.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £141.29m £141.34m £129.86m £109.53m £110.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.23m £2.15m £3.60m £4.02m £3.60m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £51.00k £56.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £101.20m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0