THE FAWCETT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1108769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time Download