Financial history THE FAWCETT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1108769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £674.83k £844.47k £1.35m £936.97k £1.09m
Total expenditure £656.51k £849.34k £1.06m £922.37k £1.03m
Income from government contracts £0 £23.09k £69.27k £16.07k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £59.80k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £642.07k £774.60k £1.30m £866.91k £978.67k
Income - Other trading activities £25.67k £38.39k £50.10k £37.16k £80.88k
Income - Charitable activities £6.92k £31.45k £3.35k £26.78k £10.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £987 £679
Income - Other £168 £28 £0 £5.15k £21.71k
Income - Legacies £134 £0 £0 £1.00k £81.98k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £631.20k £774.88k £946.70k £836.55k £924.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £25.31k £74.46k £110.25k £85.82k £101.55k
Expenditure - Governance £5.79k £12.82k £18.36k £21.18k £7.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £90.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0