STOP HATE UK

Charity number: 1062692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download