Trustees MOUNTAIN TRAINING TRUST
Charity number: 1064023

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Soraya Abdel-Hadi | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW TENNANT | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Dickinson | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Coates | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Saddler | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hugh Halliwell | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rowley | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ashman | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rosser | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa O'Keefe | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.