LONDON CATALYST

Charity number: 1066739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £320.90k £322.11k £365.86k £328.73k £229.42k
Total expenditure £427.82k £415.42k £429.13k £435.00k £436.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A