Financial history 'GIFTS FOR ROMANIA'

Charity number: 1067649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £5.28k £5.17k £5.11k £4.92k £3.94k
Total expenditure £5.46k £5.17k £4.89k £5.16k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A