Trustees MADELEINE MARY WALKER FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1062657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS M P FRANKLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Joseph Gerard Reilly | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Becky Gaynon-Johnson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Frankland | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gaynon | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Ben Gunter | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JOSEPH POWER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WESTGARTH-TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR P F BENFIELD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.