Financial history THE OAKES TRUST (SHEFFIELD)

Charity number: 1064155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £736.39k £325.55k £788.78k £244.43k £281.27k
Total expenditure £293.25k £277.95k £265.84k £193.62k £191.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.00k £32.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £541.92k N/A £580.83k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £13.39k N/A £9.80k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £162.76k N/A £177.74k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £18.31k N/A £20.41k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £4.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £276.69k N/A £256.20k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.92k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £10.64k N/A £9.65k N/A N/A