Financial history BEAVERS ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1068736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £104.77k £371.34k £286.44k £426.23k £428.08k
Total expenditure £134.96k £324.41k £272.85k £431.27k £357.23k
Income from government contracts £39.79k N/A N/A £13.24k N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £30.50k £111.06k £21.95k £98.95k