THE TYNEHOLME TRUST

Charity number: 1064439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required