THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £590.96k £498.74k £657.84k £702.60k £520.46k
Total expenditure £656.06k £621.26k £603.23k £653.23k £563.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £38.48k £3.08k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £162.50k N/A £50.69k £72.22k £43.77k
Income - Other trading activities £6.67k N/A £6.67k £7.60k £11.67k
Income - Charitable activities £413.53k N/A £592.35k £614.53k £456.79k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.27k N/A £8.13k £8.25k £8.23k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.07k N/A £569.22k £616.48k £529.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £69.99k N/A £34.02k £36.75k £34.15k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £27.59k £30.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0