WAI YIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1073437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUANITA YAU Chair None on record
Joanne Hai Ngan Chan Trustee 26 July 2018 None on record
Sui Ting Kong Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record
MIMI PUITAK WEBSTER LAM Trustee 24 August 2012 None on record
Echo Mei Rong Li-Doward Trustee 07 December 2017 None on record
SALLY LI Trustee None on record
Wei Shieong Lau Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record
Xiaofang Karen Wang Trustee 04 February 2018 None on record