Accounts and annual returns PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1063973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 15 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 31 March 2022 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 31 March 2022 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 March 2022 852 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 March 2022 1217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required