Financial history PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1063973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £17.02k £19.02k £18.72k £683 £279
Total expenditure £19.70k £20.92k £23.34k £1.22k £259
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A