Financial history BRITISH ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1066994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.23m £2.93m £3.14m £3.39m £2.63m
Total expenditure £2.87m £3.12m £3.34m £3.33m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £619.68k £278.56k £122.46k £365.55k £153.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £7.32k £7.95k
Income - Charitable activities £2.46m £2.51m £2.87m £2.88m £2.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £138.65k £137.01k £134.19k £136.26k £110.93k
Income - Other £13.13k £9.29k £10.72k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £488.72k £116.64k £7.41k £315.78k £100.14k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.75m £2.99m £3.24m £3.19m £2.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.00k £73.14k £97.94k £139.54k £111.79k
Expenditure - Governance £164.73k £216.13k £336.75k £285.37k £333.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £66.09k £75.76k £74.15k £112.25k £183.24k
Expenditure - Investment management £47.45k £53.58k £54.01k £35.10k £47.82k
Expenditure - Other £51.05k £55.88k £0 £0 £126.14k