Financial history THE CHRISTIAN CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1071039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £407.33k £522.41k £442.88k £396.12k £379.27k
Total expenditure £380.97k £414.53k £434.08k £394.71k £466.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £52.30k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £102.14k £24.42k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £129.48k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £392.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £259 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £310 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £122.99k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £414.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A