Accounts and annual returns ANIMAL FRIENDS

Charity number: 1064468
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 December 2018 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required