Financial history AMBITIOUS ABOUT AUTISM

Charity number: 1063184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.21m £16.46m £18.78m £20.04m £22.85m
Total expenditure £17.88m £15.22m £18.17m £19.24m £21.58m
Income from government contracts £13.80k £11.73m £13.86m £14.65m £16.58m
Income from government grants £0 £2.14m £2.70m £3.03m £3.58m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.77m £2.17m £1.98m £2.03m £2.31m
Income - Other trading activities £97.00k £40.00k £93.00k £63.00k £238.00k
Income - Charitable activities £14.18m £14.20m £16.64m £17.77m £20.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78.00k £52.00k £66.00k £53.00k £39.00k
Income - Other £6.08m £0 £0 £118.00k £31.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.72m £14.45m £17.20m £18.29m £20.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.16m £775.00k £964.00k £948.00k £655.00k
Expenditure - Governance £365.00k £231.00k £298.00k £328.00k £371.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.00k £14.00k £12.00k £12.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0