Accounts and annual returns DEAN BANK AND FERRYHILL LITERARY INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1077082
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 May 2016 On time
Annual return 31 December 2014 26 May 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 15 June 2015 On time
Annual return 31 December 2013 13 May 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 15 May 2014 On time
Annual return 31 December 2012 11 April 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 15 April 2013 On time