Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH

Charity number: 1063271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 February 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required