Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH

Charity number: 1063271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.18k £5.51k £5.38k £2.76k £15.17k
Total expenditure £3.83k £4.92k £9.14k £6.14k £1.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A