Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH

Charity number: 1063271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Donald Tyndale McGill Chair 26 January 2021
None on record
Alix Smith Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Rosemary Winson Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Heather Balston Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
JEFFREY LONG Trustee 30 January 2013
STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE CHARITY
Received: On time
Stephen Andrew Brown Trustee 16 November 2012
None on record
David J James Trustee
None on record
HELEN ROWE Trustee
None on record