Trustees HINDU TEMPLE NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1095353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amrit Paul Vedhera Chair 17 May 2019
None on record
Bhavesh Vasa Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Rajesh Thamman Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Dipak Patel Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Nirmal Sehgal Trustee 17 May 2019
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Angela Kumar Trustee 20 May 2018
None on record
DR Vinay Sharma Trustee 20 May 2018
None on record
TARSEM CHOPRA Trustee 21 May 2017
None on record
Sudarshan Rehan Trustee 01 May 2015
None on record
Anoop Puri Trustee 18 May 2014
KEY ENTERPRISES (1983) LIMITED
Received: On time
RISE NORTH EAST
Received: On time
TONY HANDA Trustee 18 May 2014
None on record
SANDEEP KAPOOR Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record