Financial history THE GEOFF HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1067258
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £48.50k £51.05k £52.12k £43.04k £60.59k
Total expenditure £193.03k £103.01k £28.49k £19.57k £25.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A