MERSEYSIDE SOCIETY FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 1065021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2017 On time Download